HI HB739 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB739
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fines for violations involving use of mobile electronic devices while operating a motor vehicle.
Title
Relating To Highway Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-10-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB739 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=739&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB739_.HTM |