HI HB750 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB750
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the dam and appurtenance loan and grant programs for plans, design, construction, and equipment that is used to improve deficient dams and appurtenances as determined by the Department of Land and Natural Resources and approved by the Board of Land and Natural Resources. Specifies eligibility requirements for dam and appurtenance improvement grants. Establishes the dam and appurtenance improvement tax credit for expenditures for dam and appurtenance improvements that bring dams and appurtenances up to code. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Dam And Appurtenance Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=750&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB750_.HTM |