HI HB756 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB756
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates one of the at-large positions on the board of agriculture as the chairperson of the Hawaiian homes commission. Provides that the chairperson of the Hawaiian homes commission will serve on the board of agriculture upon the expiration of an at-large position's term. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Board Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass Third Reading. Ayes, 12; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 13 (Senator(s) Acasio, Dela Cruz, English, Fevella, Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1572) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee on JDC has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-01-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from AEN/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HWN, JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 248). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward. |
2021-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB756 (Carry Over) 2021-04-13 - Failed to pass Third Reading. Ayes, 12; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 13 (Senator(s) Acasio, Dela Cruz, English, Fevella, Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none).