HI HB766 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB766
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to inventory historic properties and burial sites in the State, collect data on burial site locations, and conduct an archaeological surface survey.
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB766 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB75 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 5:00PM in conference room 229.
SB75 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 5:00PM in conference room 229.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Burial Sites
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Historic Properties
Inventory
State Historic Preservation Division
Burial Sites
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Historic Properties
Inventory
State Historic Preservation Division
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=766&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB766_.HTM |