HI HB767 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB767
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to pursue and obtain accreditation for the Conservation and Resources Enforcement Program from the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. Appropriates funds. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Conservation And Resources Enforcement Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2023-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-31 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB767 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
SB70 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB70 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Accreditation
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement
Law Enforcement
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement
Law Enforcement
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=767&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB767_HD1_.HTM |