HI HB769 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Human Services to oversee a three-year demonstration project permitting two private-pay individuals to live in the same community care foster family home under specified conditions. (HB769 HD1)
Title
Human Services; Community Care Foster Family Home; Private Pay Clients
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 480), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Yamane, Ching. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-14-11 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Re-referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 13 | |
2011-02-08 | (H) HD 1 adopted and recommitted to HUS for further consideration with none voting no and none excused. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Recommends recommittal to HUS. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 125) as amended in HD 1. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hanohano, Wooley. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 01-31-11 10:15AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HUS, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |