HI HB774 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Pulehunui community development district. Establishes community development district authority boards for each community development district. Amends the membership and reassigns certain duties of the Hawaii Community Development Authority to the community development district authority boards. Effective 7/1/2021; provided that certain provisions are effective 07/1/2022. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Development Districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/06/2021 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/21/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 173). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 173) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 016. |
2021-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-22-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 016. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Yamashita Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Inouye, Moriwaki Co-Chairs. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 711) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-08-21 10:10AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 75). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 715), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 429) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB480 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.