HI HB774 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB774
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes rules of ethics applicable to persons who are contracted, subcontracted, assigned, delegated, ordered, appointed, or in any other act allowed by a state agency to work with children. Establishes additional procedures with respect to fees, candor and fairness before a tribunal, standards of proof, and a complaint filing process. Specifies that the contracts of any person who violates the rules of ethics are voidable on behalf of the State.
Title
Relating To Persons Working With Children.
Sponsors
Rep. May Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to LGO, HUS, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB774 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO, HUS, JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=774&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB774_.HTM |