HI HB782 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB782
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person who: is married to an active duty member in the National Guard, military reserves, or armed forces; accompanies his or her spouse on a permanent change of station to Hawaii; and holds a current, unencumbered license in another jurisdiction in specific professions to apply for licensure on an expedited basis in the State of Hawaii. Effective 7/1/3050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-25-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CMV, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB782 (Carry Over) 2021-02-25 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.