HI HB785 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB785
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for the operational expenses and staffing costs of the Hawaii Association of Conservation Districts. (HB785 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Association Of Conservation Districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 361) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB785 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).