HI HB786 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires agencies to exercise reasonable care in the maintenance of all government records under its control that are required to be made available for public inspection.
Title
Government Records; Maintenance; Duty to Exercise Reasonable Care; Public Inspection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-17 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB140 (Same As) 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=786&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB786_.HTM |