HI HB795 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB795
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for certification of a reforestation carbon project at Haleakala, Maui, operated by DLNR, under an established forest carbon standard certification system. Requires DLNR to submit an annual report on the project certification to the legislature. (HB795 HD1)
Title
Relating To Carbon Forestry Certification.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 145). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 876), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 462) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB795 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to WTL, WAM.