HI HB800 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB800
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for taxpayers who lease housing to certain low-income tenants.
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB771 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB800 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB800 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=800&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB800_.HTM |