HI HB808 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB808
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Deputy Director of Highways of the Department of Transportation to be subject to the advice and consent of the Senate.
Title
Relating To The Deputy Director Of Highways Of The Department Of Transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB28 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB808 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 3
HB808 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=808&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB808_.HTM |