HI HB810 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to CPN/TEC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to CPN/TEC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Public Utilities Commission to consider the value of implementing advanced grid modernization technology in the State. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD2)
Title
Grid Infrastructure Modernization Technology; Electric Utilities; Electric Systems; Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN/TEC, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 280). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Fale voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Evans, Har. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-25-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 240) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen, Hanohano, Fale; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1040 (Same As) 2013-04-23 - Act 034, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134).