HI HB810 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB810
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a person may be tried and sentenced for certain alleged felony offenses through the complaint and preliminary hearing process, indictment by grand jury, or by written information. Specifies that multiple attempts to initiate a felony prosecution for the same offense, either through the same initial charging method or an alternative method, or in different forums, shall not be permitted, except in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating To The Initiation Of Felony Prosecutions.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB810 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
SB36 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Act 001, on 03/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
SB36 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Act 001, on 03/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=810&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB810_.HTM |