HI HB827 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Employer contribution amounts for plan years 2011-2012 and 2012-2013 for Hawaii Employer Union Health Benefits Trust Fund health benefit plan premiums for the employees of collective bargaining unit 10 and its excluded counterparts.
Title
Employer Union Health Benefits Trust Fund Contributions ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1057 (Same As) 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=827&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB827_.htm |