HI HB827 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB827
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of finance, after June 30, 2020, to deposit all medicaid funds (program ID HMS401) into interest-bearing accounts operated by credit union depositories.
Title
Relating To Medicaid.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB827 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=827&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB827_.HTM |