HI HB828 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB828
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to be responsible for the maintenance of, or provide for the maintenance of, private dams and reservoirs within the State. Maintains the State's immunity from liability. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Dam Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-01-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB828 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=828&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB828_.HTM |