HI HB837 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Commissioner of Financial Institutions to require money transmitters to register with the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and establishes additional regulatory requirements. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB837 HD1)
Title
Money Transmitters; Fees; Bond
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, Ito, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Evans, Ito, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower, Tsuji; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McDermott; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Har, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-11-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-13. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1068 (Same As)