HI HB876 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking in all public coastal areas of the State.
Title
Smoking; Coastal Area
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, WAL, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1342 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/WLA, JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=876&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB876_.HTM |