HI HB885 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB885
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations and approves payments for claims against the State, its officers, and its employees.
Title
Making Appropriations For Claims Against The State, Its Officers, Or Its Employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB885 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB1039 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Act 015, on 05/19/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
SB1039 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Act 015, on 05/19/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=885&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB885_.HTM |