HI HB901 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Resolves claims and disputes relating to the portion of income and proceeds from the lands of the public land trust for use by the office of Hawaiian affairs between 11/7/1978 and 7/1/2008; conveys certain parcels of real property in fee simple to the office of Hawaiian affairs. (SD1)
Title
Office of Hawaiian Affairs; Public Land Trust
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO/WAM. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO/WAM. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Re-Referred to WTL, JGO/WAM. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Fukunaga, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Takamine, Hemmings. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure. | |
2009-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-09 2:45pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to WTL/JGO, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 164). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Berg voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-2009. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 968) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-09 12:30 in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 616) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Belatti, Bertram, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 17 | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-09 11:00 AM in conference room 329. | |
2009-02-14 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-18-09, 11:00am, rm329. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Saturday, 02-14-09 10:05am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Thursday, 02-12-09 6:05pm at King Kaumualii Elementary School Kauai. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-11-09 6:05pm at Keaukaha Elementary School Hilo. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Tuesday, 02-10-09 6:05pm at Kealakehe Elementary School Kona. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-10-09. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Monday, 02-09-09 6:05pm at Pakukalo Community Center Maui. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, WLO/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 11 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to HAW/WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |