HI HB902 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts a container of liquid which is deemed to be the sole item of a meal or the diet from the Deposit Beverage Container Program. Removes the exemption for dietary supplement beverage containers from the Deposit Beverage Container Program. Effective July 4, 2100. (HB902 HD2)
Title
Deposit Beverage Container Program; Dietary Supplements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott voting no (3) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 512) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Carroll, Evans, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Yamane. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-11-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cheape, Cullen, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, McDermott voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2). |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Kawakami; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Fale; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Hanohano. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1133 (Same As)