HI HB902 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it clear that the police may grant applications to acquire firearms to lawful permanent resident aliens.
Title
Acquisition of Firearms by Lawful Permanent Resident Aliens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1071 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=902&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB902_.HTM |