HI HB903 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB903
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-23-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-23-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "renewable portfolio standard" to more accurately reflect the percentage of renewable energy penetration in the State. Establishes renewable portfolio standards and targets for gas utility companies that mirrors those set for electric utility companies. (HB903 HD1)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-23-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB903 (Carry Over) 2017-02-21 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-23-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
SB782 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to TRE, CPH.
SB782 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to TRE, CPH.