HI HB924 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB924
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the exemption from the requirement that plans and specifications for construction projects be prepared and construction observed by a licensed engineer, architect, or landscape architect to be determined by floor area of work rather than estimated cost. Exempts one- or two-storied structures that are used primarily as a residence from such requirements.
Title
Relating To Building Industry Professionals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1461 (Same As) 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
HB924 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB924 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=924&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB924_.HTM |