HI HB926 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits inclusion of accreted lands in determining shoreline setback line in counties with a population over 500,000. (HB926 HD1)
Title
Shoreline setback; Accretion
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-24-11 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 527) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Morita, Nakashima, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Chong, Thielen. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-11 9:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-14-11 at 9:30AM. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 02-11-11 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |