HI HB952 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 167, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 167, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures confidentiality of a complainant in an investigation of wage and hour violations for public works projects. (HB952 CD1)
Title
Public Works Law; Complaints
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Act 167, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Act 167, 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268). |
2015-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 647). |
2015-04-29 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 690). |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (3). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-15. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 1). |
2015-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-29-15. |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 1) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Rhoads, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Johanson, McDermott. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 343). |
2015-03-27 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 374) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-25-15. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 947) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 253). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Jordan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 752) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Nakashima. |
2015-02-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:05PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-15 at 1:05PM in room 325. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-27-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 335) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi. |
2015-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-13-15 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1121 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 30