HI HB955 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the penalties imposed for failure to comply with Act 326, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, by establishing civil penalties that shall be imposed no more than once per year instead of criminal penalties. (HB955 HD1)
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 418) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 02-11-13 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to TOU, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1186 (Same As) 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to CPN/TSM, WAM.