HI HB958 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii health corps program to provide loan repayments on behalf of eligible physicians, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners in any county having a shortage of physicians, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners, with priority given to in rural areas. Provides for loan repayments by the University of Hawaii John A. Burns school of medicine. Makes appropriations to support accreditation efforts and support and expand residency programs, particularly in family medicine.
Title
Hawaii Health Corps; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB596 (Same As) 2012-06-29 - (S) Act 187, 6/28/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=958 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB958_.HTM |