HI HB961 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Act 171, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Act 171, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the types of entities from which a Preschool Open Doors service provider may obtain accreditation. Beginning 1/1/2024, expands the Preschool Open Doors Program application process to eligible 3year-old children. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Early Learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-03 | Senate | Act 171, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274). |
2023-07-03 | House | Act 171, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274). |
2023-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 76). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 76) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Wakai, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson, Kitagawa, Amato, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Marten. |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-23 4:55PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 4:55PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Woodson, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Amato, Marten, Matsumoto. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 860). |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 914). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Kanuha. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 795) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1789) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1377) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-22-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 86). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Alcos voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 928), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett. |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 721), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-02-16 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3). |
2023-02-06 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 67) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-02-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1023 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).