HI HB965 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes 2 staff positions for the state fire council to accomplish its statutory duties and responsibilities. Requires the positions to be funded by the annual budgets of the department of labor and industrial relations.
Title
Public Safety; State Fire Council; Administrative Staff
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from PBM/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 374), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Fontaine. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Fontaine. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM/LAB on Friday, 02-11-11 11:15AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to PBM/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |