HI HB965 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB965
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to CPC/HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to CPC/HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends Hawaii's prepaid health care law to cover qualified independent contractors. Includes criteria to be used in determining whether a person is classified as a qualified independent contractor.
Title
Relating To Prepaid Healthcare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to CPC/HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Re-referred to CPC/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB965 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Re-referred to CPC/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 7
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=965&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB965_.HTM |