HI HB969 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB969
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits elected officials from receiving any income from private sources that exceeds, in aggregate, twenty per cent of their government salary.
Title
Relating To Limiting Private Retainers Of Elective Officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB969 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to CPC, LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=969&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB969_.HTM |