HI HB970 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB970
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to assume review of the effect of any proposed project on historic properties or burial sites for lands under its jurisdiction.
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation Reviews.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB970 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2
SB1124 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB1124 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=970&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB970_.HTM |