HI HB981 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, rather than authorizes, UH to establish policies and procedures for the awarding of credits for college-level learning gained from work or other life experiences, other than military service covered under current law. Requires UH to report to the Legislature on its progress in awarding the college credits. (HB981 HD1)
Title
UH; College-Credit Equivalency Program; Work and Life Experience
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 478) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Kong, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tupola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-03-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |