HI HCR100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR100
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 44
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 44
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Evaluate The Potential Impacts Of Mandating Licensure Of All Private Schools In The State.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Evaluate The Potential Impacts Of Mandating Licensure Of All Private Schools In The State.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Lei Learmont [D] |
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 44 |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EDN/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR85 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 44
HCR100 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 29
HCR100 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 29
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=100&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR100_.HTM |