HI HCR106 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR106
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to PSM/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to PSM/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Introduce And Support Legislation That Would Repeal The $10,000 Limitation On The Deduction For State And Local Taxes Enacted By The Federal Tax Cuts And Jobs Act Of 2017.
Title
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Introduce And Support Legislation That Would Repeal The $10,000 Limitation On The Deduction For State And Local Taxes Enacted By The Federal Tax Cuts And Jobs Act Of 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WAM. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 436). |
2022-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1730-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-22 3:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1601-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-30 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto. |
2022-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-30-22 10:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR102 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR106 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to PDP, CPC, referral sheet 25
SCR80 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
HCR106 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to PDP, CPC, referral sheet 25
SCR80 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Referred to PSM, WAM.