HI HCR112 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HWN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to HWN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Submit A Report To The Legislature Regarding Its Policy To Develop Rental Properties For Occupancy By Its Beneficiaries And Ensure That Beneficiaries Maintain Their Placement On The Waitlist For Homestead Leases While Residing In A Department Rental.
Title
Affordable Housing; Department of Hawaiian Home Lands; Rentals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 462). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1451-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1287-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representativ(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-03-19 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-19-14 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
2014-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=112&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR112_.HTM |