HI HCR112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR112
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Establish Performance Based Revenue Mechanisms That Directly Tie An Electric Utility's Revenues To The Utility's Achievement On Performance Metrics.
Title
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Establish Performance Based Revenue Mechanisms That Directly Tie An Electric Utility's Revenues To The Utility's Achievement On Performance Metrics.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1435) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Kong. |
2017-03-17 | House | Proposed draft of resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-21-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-17 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
2017-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR112 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HR66 (Same As) 2017-03-17 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 325.
HR66 (Same As) 2017-03-17 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 325.