HI HCR12 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR12
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Judiciary To Assign One Judge For The Hope Probation Program.
Title
Urging The Judiciary To Assign One Judge For The Hope Probation Program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 18 |
2022-02-22 | House | Offered |
2022-02-18 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR10 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR12 (Carry Over) 2021-03-29 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR12 (Carry Over) 2021-03-29 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=12&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR12_.HTM |