HI HCR120 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR120
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to PVM/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to PVM/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Navy To Work With The State Of Hawaii To Establish A Designated Offshore Site In The Ocean Surrounding The State For The Development Of Offshore Wind Power Stations.
Title
Requesting The United States Navy To Work With The State Of Hawaii To Establish A Designated Offshore Site In The Ocean Surrounding The State For The Development Of Offshore Wind Power Stations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to PVM/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR101 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to PVM/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 40
HCR120 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR120 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=120&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR120_.HTM |