HI HCR120 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Evslin, Garrett, Kila, Lamosao, Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Evslin, Garrett, Kila, Lamosao, Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Order Hawaiian Electric To Continue To Deploy And Pursue Community-based Renewable Energy Projects.
Title
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Order Hawaiian Electric To Continue To Deploy And Pursue Community-based Renewable Energy Projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Evslin, Garrett, Kila, Lamosao, Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7). |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1345-24), recommending referral to CPC. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Ward. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:31AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
2024-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR101 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Evslin, Garrett, Kila, Lamosao, Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=120&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HCR120_.HTM |