HI HCR123 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR123
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Study Of Potential Projects That Would Reduce Energy Costs For All State Departments And Agencies.
Title
Requesting A Study Of Potential Projects That Would Reduce Energy Costs For All State Departments And Agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 704). |
2018-05-01 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Onishi, Takumi excused (2). |
2018-05-01 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 822) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported from GVO/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3811) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Keith-Agaran. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-18 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to GVO/TRE. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 436). |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1785-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1528-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Yamane. |
2018-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR123 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to CPH/HMS.