HI HCR126 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Interagency Council For Transit-oriented Development To Establish A State Tod Investments Task Force To Prioritize Near-term Infrastructure Projects For Funding Within Priority Transit-oriented Development Areas.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Interagency Council For Transit-oriented Development To Establish A State Tod Investments Task Force To Prioritize Near-term Infrastructure Projects For Funding Within Priority Transit-oriented Development Areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from TRN/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1141), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN/HSG on Friday, 03-19-21 11:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to TRN/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR126 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HR103 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HR103 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).