HI HCR130 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) Referred to PGM/TIA/TSM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Government Operations, and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) Referred to PGM/TIA/TSM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Government Operations, and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Congress Of The United States To Support And Include The Philippines In The Visa Improvements To Stimulate International Tourism To The United States Of America Act.
Title
VISIT USA Act; Philippines
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (S) Referred to PGM/TIA/TSM. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 549). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Oshiro excused (2). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Reported from INT/TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1696-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka, Awana, Choy, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Brower, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by INT/TOU on Monday, 03-19-12 9:45AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to INT/TOU, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-13 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR98 (Same As) 2012-04-12 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.