HI HCR138 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED/EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Manahan excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED/EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Manahan excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Endorsing The Renaming Of The Science Technology Engineering Mathematics (stem) Initiatives To The Science Technology Engineering Agriculture Mathematics (steam) Initiatives.
Title
STEM; Agriculture; STEAM; Education; Science; Technology; Engineering; Mathematics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED/EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Manahan excused (2). | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1341-12), recommending referral to HED/EDN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to AGR, HED/EDN, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-13 | (H) To be offered. |