HI HCR138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR138
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The County Of Hawaii To Create Alternate Routes To Properties In The Puna District That Were Affected, But Not Destroyed, By The 2018 Kilauea Eruption.
Title
Urging The County Of Hawaii To Create Alternate Routes To Properties In The Puna District That Were Affected, But Not Destroyed, By The 2018 Kilauea Eruption.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 618). |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2002), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-27 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4). |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1750), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:00AM in conference room 430. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR138 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS/PSM.
HR127 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR127 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=138&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR138_.HTM |