HI HCR143 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 756).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 756).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The National Oceanic And Atmospheric Administration To Exempt Certain Coral Species In All State Waters, Particularly Commercial Harbors, From Reclassification Under A Proposed Federal Rule Change.
Title
Harbors; Endangered Species; NOAA
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 756). |
2013-04-26 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-26 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Ward excused (2). |
2013-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 730) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from TIA/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1595) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-13 1:16PM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to TIA/ENE. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 681). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-06 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-10-13 11:15AM in conference room 309. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR114 (Same As) 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=143&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR143_.HTM |